CA AB2482 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 510 of, and to add Section 511.5 to, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: flexible work schedules.
Sponsors
Asm. Randy Voepel [R] | Asm. Catharine Baker [R] | Asm. Dante Acosta [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] |
Sen. Tom Berryhill [R] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Asm. Matthew Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 511.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |