CA AB2492 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66281.10 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: sex discrimination complaints: advocates and coordinators.
Sponsors
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D] | Asm. Mike Fong [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2492 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2492 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 16). |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66281.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |