CA AB2498 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 14 (commencing with Section 33480) of Chapter 3 of Part 20 of Division 2 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to school employees.
Title
School employees: School Social Worker Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 11). |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 33480 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44874 | Amended Code | Citation Text |