CA AB2499 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 512 of, and to add and repeal Section 515 of, the Food and Agricultural Code, and to add and repeal Section 12096.4.5 of the Government Code, relating to food and agriculture.
Title
Organic products sector: Organic Transition Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2499 Maienschein Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2499 Maienschein Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and B., P. & E.D. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 5. Page 4993.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 19). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 512 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 515 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12096.4.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |