CA AB2501 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Limón.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Limón.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 19 (commencing with Section 3273.01) to Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, and to add Section 23039 to the Financial Code, relating to COVID-19 relief.
Title
COVID-19: homeowner, tenant, and consumer relief.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 2501 Limón Assembly Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 25 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Limón. |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 28. Noes 25. Page 4892.). |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4748.) |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 3273.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 23039 | New Code | See Bill Text |