CA AB2509 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7700 of, and to add Sections 34 and 34.1 to, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to food and agriculture.
Title
Integrated pest management: invasive species: definitions.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2509 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2509 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on AGRI and N.R. & W. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 34.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 7700 | Amended Code | Citation Text |