CA AB2516 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-25 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-25 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1367.66 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 10123.18 of the Insurance Code, and to add Section 14132.04 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: human papillomavirus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2516 Aguiar-Curry Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2516 Aguiar-Curry By Skinner (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2516 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2516 Aguiar-Curry By Skinner (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2516 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-25 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 5186.). |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 4938.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.66 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.04 | New Code | See Bill Text |