CA AB2530 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 861, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 861, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14549.3 to the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling.
Title
Recycling: beverage containers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2530 GORDON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2530 Gordon By Wieckowski (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2530 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2530 Gordon By Wieckowski (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2530 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 861, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 6282.). |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 16. Page 5242.). |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 1). |
2016-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 11. Page 5249.) |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5166.) |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 3.) (May 27). |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 11). |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 14549.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 14575.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |