CA AB2531 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 968, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 968, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10008 of the Penal Code, relating to law enforcement.
Title
Deaths while in law enforcement custody: reporting.
Sponsors
Asm. Isaac Bryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2531 Bryan Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2531 Bryan By Menjivar (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2531 Bryan (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - AB 2531 Bryan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2531 Bryan By Menjivar (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2531 Bryan (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - AB 2531 Bryan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 968, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-22 | Senate | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2024-08-05 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-06-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.). |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5315.) |
2024-05-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-06 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 10008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |