CA AB254 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4646.5 and 4868 of, and to add Section 4869 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services.
Title
Developmental services: Employment First Policy.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2012-01-19 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Set, first hearing. Held under submission. | |
2012-01-11 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-01-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2011-02-18 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2011-02-04 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. | |
2011-02-03 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4646.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4868 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4869 | New Code | See Bill Text |