CA AB2541 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-09 - Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-09 - Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 33410 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearm equipment: silencers.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Feuer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 33410 | Amended Code | Citation Text |