CA AB2541 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 44203, 44225, 44227, 44253.3, 44253.10, 44253.11, 44259, 44259.1, 44259.2, 44260.2, 44275.4, 44275.5, 44277, 44301, and 44325 of the Education Code, relating to teacher credentialing.
Title
Teacher preparation programs: regionally accredited institutions.
Sponsors
Asm. Jose Medina [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2541 Medina Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4728.) |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2). |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44225 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44227 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44253.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44253.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44253.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44259 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44259.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44259.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44260.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44275.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44275.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44277 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44325 | Amended Code | Citation Text |