CA AB2557 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-05 - In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 15 in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-05 - In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 15 in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 31000.01, 31000.4.5, 37103.1, and 53060.01 to the Government Code, relating to local agencies.
Title
Local agencies: contracts for special services and temporary help: performance reports.
Sponsors
Asm. Liz Ortega [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2557 Ortega Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2557 Ortega Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 3). |
2024-06-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2024-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (June 11). |
2024-06-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and L., P.E. & R. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 16.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 23). |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 31000.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 31000.4.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 37103.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 53060.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |