CA AB2558 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-27 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 12. Page 5801.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-27 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 12. Page 5801.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 24300.5, 24301, 24304.2, 26885, 26980, and 26981 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
County officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2558 Brough By Galgiani (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2558 Brough By Galgiani Reconsider (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2558 Brough By Galgiani (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2558 BROUGH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2558 Brough By Galgiani Reconsider (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2558 Brough By Galgiani (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2558 BROUGH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 12. Page 5801.). |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5108.) |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 17. Noes 8. Page 5107.). |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 20). |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 5497.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5300.) |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 24300.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 24301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 24304.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26885 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26980 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26981 | Amended Code | Citation Text |