CA AB256 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 297, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 297, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4000, 5204, and 40225 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: registration.
Sponsors
Asm. Diane Dixon [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Assembly - AB 256 Dixon Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB256 Dixon By Rubio (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - AB 256 Dixon Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB256 Dixon By Rubio (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - AB 256 Dixon Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 297, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3348.). |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2618.). |
2023-08-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-17 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1593.) |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-01-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 19. |
2023-01-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 4000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 40225 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 5204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |