CA AB2567 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-06 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-06 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8482 and 10453 of, to add Section 8482.5 to, and to repeal and add Section 8481 of, the Probate Code, relating to decedents.
Title
Decedents' estates: personal representative: bond.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Probate Code | 10453 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 8480.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Probate Code | 8482 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 8482.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |