CA AB2599 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on August 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-03 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-03 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 115880, 115885, and 116920 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to water.
Title
Water: public beaches: discontinuation of residential water service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-26 - Assembly - AB 2599 Environmental Safety and Concurrence in Senate Amendments By GARCIA (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2599 E.S. & T.M. (Garcia) By Allen (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Assembly - AB 2599 Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2599 E.S. & T.M. (Garcia) By Allen (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Assembly - AB 2599 Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-03 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2024-08-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-07 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2024-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and HEALTH. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.) |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-03-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 115880 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 115885 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116920 | Amended Code | Citation Text |