CA AB2613 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on August 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-08-28 - Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-08-28 - Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Part 4.6 (commencing with Section 124965) of Division 106 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Jacqueline Marie Zbur Rare Disease Advisory Council.
Sponsors
Asm. Rick Zbur [D] | Asm. Diane Dixon [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2613 Zbur et al. By Eggman (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2613 Zbur Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2613 Zbur Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-28 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-03-22 | Assembly | Introduced measure version corrected. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 124965 | New Code | See Bill Text |