CA AB2646 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4150 and 4453 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: vehicle registration: required information.
Sponsors
Asm. John Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2010-05-19 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-27 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-26 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-22 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 19). | |
2010-04-13 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2010-04-12 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |