CA AB2648 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Bennett.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Bennett.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12405 to the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Environmentally preferable purchasing: single-use plastic bottles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-24 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Bennett. |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (March 19). |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-03-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 12405 | New Code | See Bill Text |