CA AB2667 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 27363.5 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: child passenger restraint systems.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-23 - Assembly - AB 2667 HILL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2667 Hill By Pavley (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Assembly - AB 2667 HILL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2667 Hill By Pavley (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Assembly - AB 2667 HILL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:45 p.m. | |
2010-08-23 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6463.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6525.) | |
2010-08-20 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-20 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 3. Page 4711.) | |
2010-08-19 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-18 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-03 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-02 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-28 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-24 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 22). | |
2010-06-03 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2010-05-20 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-20 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 6. Page 5246.) | |
2010-05-17 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-13 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 12). | |
2010-05-10 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-05-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. (Corrected May 17.) | |
2010-04-28 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-20 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 19). | |
2010-04-12 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2010-04-08 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |