CA AB2669 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 175, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 175, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 633 of the Penal Code, relating to peace officers.
Title
Peace officers: communications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-06 - Assembly - AB 2669 JONES-SAWYER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2669 Jones-Sawyer By Wiener (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - AB 2669 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2669 Jones-Sawyer By Wiener (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - AB 2669 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 175, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-08-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6142.). |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5104.). |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2018-05-15 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4560.) |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 633 | Amended Code | Citation Text |