CA AB267 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 798, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 798, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13115 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to fire protection.
Title
Fire protection: tents: nonflammable materials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-07 - Assembly - AB 267 Bauer-Kahan Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB267 Bauer-Kahan By Glazer (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Assembly - AB 267 Bauer-Kahan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB267 Bauer-Kahan By Glazer (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Assembly - AB 267 Bauer-Kahan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 798, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3038.). |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3011.) |
2023-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2392.). |
2023-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-07-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1362.) |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2023-03-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-02-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.M. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.M. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.M. |
2023-01-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 23. |
2023-01-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 13115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |