CA AB2675 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 826, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 826, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2751 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment contract requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2675 SWANSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2675 Swanson By Lieu (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-21 - Senate - From Committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2675 L.& E. Assembly Third Reading By SWANSON (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2675 Swanson By Lieu (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-21 - Senate - From Committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2675 L.& E. Assembly Third Reading By SWANSON (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 826, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:40 p.m. | |
2012-08-29 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 6499.). | |
2012-08-28 | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 28). | |
2012-08-27 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6357.) | |
2012-08-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-23 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4751.). | |
2012-08-21 | From committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 21). Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-20 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2012-08-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-15 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-07-02 | Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-27 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2012-06-25 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-21 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-06-18 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Lieu. | |
2012-06-14 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-13 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 13). | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2012-05-10 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-10 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4779.) | |
2012-05-07 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-03 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 2). | |
2012-04-17 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2012-04-16 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-09 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-03-19 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2012-03-06 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 5. | |
2012-03-05 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1727 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1742 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 2751 | Amended Code | Citation Text |