CA AB2700 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 399.13 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electrical corporation: California Renewables Portfolio
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2700 BROWN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4960.) |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 399.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 454.51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |