CA AB2700 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 354, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 354, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 25328 to the Public Resources Code, and to add Sections 740.21 and 9625 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation electrification.
Title
Transportation electrification: electrical distribution grid upgrades.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2700 McCarty Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2700 McCarty et al. By Allen (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2700 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2700 McCarty et al. By Allen (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2700 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 354, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 2.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 5230.). |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-08 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-08-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-07-20 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2022-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2022-06-09 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C., E.Q. and TRANS. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 1. Page 4947.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on U. & E. and TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25328 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 740.21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 9625 | New Code | See Bill Text |