CA AB2705 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1743 of the Labor Code, relating to public works.
Title
Labor Commissioner.
Sponsors
Asm. Liz Ortega [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - AB 2705 Ortega Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - AB 2705 Ortega Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1743 | Amended Code | Citation Text |