CA AB2711 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-26 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Muratsuchi.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-26 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Muratsuchi.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to oil and gas, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Oil and gas: loan to City of Hermosa Beach.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Muratsuchi. |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 25525.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |