CA AB2716 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 549, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 549, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3008 of, and to add Section 3206.1.5 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to oil and gas.
Title
Oil and gas: low-production wells: Baldwin Hills Conservancy: Equitable Community Repair and Reinvestment Account.
Sponsors
Asm. Isaac Bryan [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2716 Bryan Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2716 Bryan et al. By Smallwood-Cuevas (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2716 Bryan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2716 Bryan et al. By Smallwood-Cuevas (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2716 Bryan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 549, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 13.). |
2024-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2024-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9.). |
2024-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 15). |
2024-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 15.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 8). |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 3008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3206.1.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |