CA AB2721 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on August 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-03 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-03 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19227, 19315, 42653, and 58231 of, and to add Section 58231.1 to, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to food and agriculture, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Food and agriculture: omnibus bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-26 - Assembly - AB 2721 Agriculture Concurrence in Senate Amendments By SORIA (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2721 AGRI. (Soria) By Caballero (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2721 Agriculture Assembly Third Reading By SORIA (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2721 AGRI. (Soria) By Caballero (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2721 Agriculture Assembly Third Reading By SORIA (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-03 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2024-08-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-12 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-08 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-08 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2024-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 19227 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 19315 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 42653 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 58231 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 58231.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |