CA AB2742 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 21806 and 42001.12 of the Vehicle Code, relating to emergency vehicles.
Title
Emergency vehicles: penalties.
Sponsors
Asm. Kate Sanchez [R] | Asm. Phillip Chen [R] | Asm. Laurie Davies [R] | Asm. Diane Dixon [R] |
Asm. Heath Flora [R] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Asm. Jim Patterson [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Megan Dahle [R] | Asm. Tri Ta [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 21806 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 42001.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |