CA AB2751 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 79, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 79, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 98.6, 1019, and 1024.6 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Retaliation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-23 - Assembly - AB 2751 HERNANDEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2751 Roger Hern (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2751 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2751 Roger Hern (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2751 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 79, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-06-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 4. Page 5648.). |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 1. Page 4020.). |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 10). |
2014-05-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 19. Page 4964.) |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 7). |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 13. |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1019 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1024.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 98.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |