CA AB2751 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 718, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 718, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1164.3 of, and to add Sections 1149.3, 1164.10, and 6721 to, the Labor Code, relating to agricultural labor relations.
Title
Agricultural labor relations.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2751 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 28 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2751 Mark Stone By Monning (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2751 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2751 Mark Stone By Monning (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2751 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 718, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 28. Page 6824.). |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 5700.). |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). |
2018-07-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 5614.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25). |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1149.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 1150.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 1164.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 1164.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 6721 | New Code | See Bill Text |