CA AB2761 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 3.1 (commencing with Section 42090) to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to public health.
Title
Product safety: plastic packaging: Reducing Toxics in Packaging Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Gregg Hart [D] | Asm. Josh Lowenthal [D] | Asm. Luz Rivas [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2761 Hart Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 11.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42090 | New Code | See Bill Text |