CA AB277 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 131103 and 131241 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Transportation: local retail transaction and use taxes:
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-07-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB277 Ammiano By Yee (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-21 - Assembly - AB 277 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-21 - Assembly - AB 277 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-14 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2009-08-17 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2009-08-05 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2009-07-30 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2009-07-16 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-07-16 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 1759.) | |
2009-06-18 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-17 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (June 16). | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2009-05-21 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 29. Page 1613.) | |
2009-05-12 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-11 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-05-07 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 6). | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2009-02-13 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. | |
2009-02-12 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 131103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 131241 | Amended Code | Citation Text |