CA AB2770 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 117, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 117, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22801, 23200, 23201, 23202, 24600, and 26004 of the Education Code, and to amend Sections 31628, 31720.91, 31783.5, 75521, 75553, 75570, and 75571.5 of the Government Code, relating to public employees’ retirement.
Title
Public employees’ retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2770 P. E. & R. (McKinnor) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Assembly - AB 2770 Public Employment and Retirement Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Assembly - AB 2770 Public Employment and Retirement Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 117, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-07-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-07-01 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-06-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4627.). |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4999.) |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 22801 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 23200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 23201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 23202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 24600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 26004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31628 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31720.91 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31783.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 75521 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 75553 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 75570 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 75571.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |