CA AB2779 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Mark Stone.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Mark Stone.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6.3 (commencing with Section 42380) to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling.
Title
Recycling: single-use plastic beverage container caps.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Mark Stone. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5299.) |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 9). |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42380 | New Code | See Bill Text |