CA AB2788 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7922.535 of the Government Code, relating to public records.
Title
Public records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7922.535 | Amended Code | Citation Text |