CA AB2800 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Aging And Long-Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Aging And Long-Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 15610.57, 15610.63, and 15657 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to elders and dependent adults.
Title
Elders and dependent adults: abuse or neglect.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and JUD. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15610.57 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15610.63 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15657 | Amended Code | Citation Text |