CA AB2817 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 121 (commencing with Section 152000) to the Health and Safety Code, relating to the Office of Health Care Quality and Affordability.
Title
Office of Health Care Quality and Affordability.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 152000 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2817 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2817 |