CA AB2821 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 164, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 164, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 69996.6 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
California Kids Investment and Development Savings Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2821 Nazarian By Cortese Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2821 Nazarian Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2821 Nazarian Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 164, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4677.). |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 4659.). |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69996.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |