CA AB2829 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 4459.9 of the Government Code, relating to disability access, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Certified Access Specialist Inspection Grant Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 4459.9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |