CA AB2847 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 104, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 104, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1946 and 1951.3 of, and to add Section 1951.35 to, the Civil Code, relating to real property.
Title
Commercial real property: tenancy: abandonment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-02 - Assembly - AB 2847 RUBIO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2847 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 2847 RUBIO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2847 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 2847 RUBIO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 104, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-07-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:15 a.m. |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6059.). |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4880.). |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5167.) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1945 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1945.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1946 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1951.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1951.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 2929.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |