CA AB2858 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 49062.5 to the Education Code, relating to pupil data.
Title
Collection of pupil demographic data: Chaldean or Assyrian category.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49062.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |