CA AB2859 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 473, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 473, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 464 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Professions and vocations: retired category: licenses.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2859 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2859 Low By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2859 LOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2859 Low By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2859 LOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 473, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6393.). |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5301.). |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 1). |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4688.) |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 463 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 464 | New Code | See Bill Text |