CA AB2859 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 240, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 240, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 4106.5 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to pharmacy.
Title
Pharmacy: safe storage products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-13 - Assembly - AB 2859 CABALLERO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2859 Caballero et al. By McGuire (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - AB 2859 CABALLERO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 8 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2859 Caballero et al. By McGuire (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - AB 2859 CABALLERO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 8 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 240, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-08-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 3. Page 6244.). |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5240.). |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-06-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-05-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 8. Page 5033.) |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (April 25). |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4106.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |