CA AB2867 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 15 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-08-23 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 15 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-08-23 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 388 of, and to add Section 338.2 to, the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Recovery of artwork and personal property lost due to persecution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-15 - Assembly - AB 2867 Gabriel Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2867 Gabriel et al. By Wiener Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Assembly - AB 2867 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2867 Gabriel et al. By Wiener Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Assembly - AB 2867 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-12 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.). |
2024-07-01 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-07-01 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2024-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 338.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 388 | Amended Code | Citation Text |