CA AB288 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 925, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 925, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 24 (commencing with Section 70045) to Chapter 2 of Part 42 of Division 5 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to student financial aid.
Title
California Ban on Scholarship Displacement Act of 2021.
Sponsors
Asm. Lisa Calderon [D] | Asm. Mia Bonta [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Sen. Monique Limon [D] |
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-22 - Assembly - AB 288 Calderon Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB288 Calderon et al. By Skinner (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Assembly - AB 288 Calderon Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB288 Calderon et al. By Skinner (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Assembly - AB 288 Calderon Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 925, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-29 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4869.). |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3434.) |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 20). |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 47.1 invoked. (Calderon). |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 21. |
2021-01-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 70045 | New Code | See Bill Text |