CA AB2881 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and JUD.
Pending: Assembly Arts, Entertainment, Sports, Tourism, and Internet Media Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and JUD.
Pending: Assembly Arts, Entertainment, Sports, Tourism, and Internet Media Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 13 (commencing with Section 53172) to Chapter 1 of Part 1 of Division 2 of Title 5 of, and to repeal Section 53080 of, the Government Code, relating to discrimination.
Title
Discrimination: Fair Play in Community Sports Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and JUD. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53080 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53172 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2881 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2881 |