CA AB2884 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on September 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 304, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on September 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 304, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 660, 789, 1215.5, 1669, 1681, 1726, 1807.5, 10168.6, 10234.6, 10234.95, 10236.1, 10236.13, 10236.14, 10236.15, 11520.5, 11691, and 12921.1 of, to repeal Section 736.5 of, and to repeal and add Section 1682 of, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-23 - Assembly - AB 2884 INS. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By DALY (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2884 Committee On INS.(Daly) By Roth (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Assembly - AB 2884 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2884 Committee On INS.(Daly) By Roth (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Assembly - AB 2884 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 304, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6139.). |
2016-08-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5054.). |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-04 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4464.) |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 13). |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10168.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10234.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10234.95 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10236.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10236.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10236.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10236.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 11520.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 11691 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1215.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 12921.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1669 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1681 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1682 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 1726 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1749.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1807.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 660 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 736.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 789 | Amended Code | Citation Text |